House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|