House | 04/17/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |