House | 03/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |