House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0659
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2026
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|