House | 04/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Stephens |