House
|
08/14/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0805
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|