Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB4068 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB4068 Introduced , by Rep. Kevin Schmidt SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2026 (instead of June 30, 2023), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Deletes language concerning an additional 20 days or 100 paid hours that an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status for the period between July 1, 2021 and June 30, 2022. Effective immediately. LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB4068 Introduced , by Rep. Kevin Schmidt SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2026 (instead of June 30, 2023), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Deletes language concerning an additional 20 days or 100 paid hours that an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status for the period between July 1, 2021 and June 30, 2022. Effective immediately. LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b A BILL FOR
22 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB4068 Introduced , by Rep. Kevin Schmidt SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
33 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
44 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
55 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2026 (instead of June 30, 2023), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Deletes language concerning an additional 20 days or 100 paid hours that an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status for the period between July 1, 2021 and June 30, 2022. Effective immediately.
66 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
77 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
88 A BILL FOR
99 HB4068LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b HB4068 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
1010 HB4068 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
1111 1 AN ACT concerning public employee benefits.
1212 2 Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
1313 3 represented in the General Assembly:
1414 4 Section 5. The Illinois Pension Code is amended by
1515 5 changing Section 16-118 as follows:
1616 6 (40 ILCS 5/16-118) (from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118)
1717 7 Sec. 16-118. Retirement. "Retirement": Entry upon a
1818 8 retirement annuity or receipt of a single-sum retirement
1919 9 benefit granted under this Article after termination of active
2020 10 service as a teacher.
2121 11 (a) An annuitant receiving a retirement annuity other than
2222 12 a disability retirement annuity may accept employment as a
2323 13 teacher from a school board or other employer specified in
2424 14 Section 16-106 without impairing retirement status, if that
2525 15 employment:
2626 16 (1) is not within the school year during which service
2727 17 was terminated; and
2828 18 (2) does not exceed the following:
2929 19 (i) before July 1, 2001, 100 paid days or 500 paid
3030 20 hours in any school year;
3131 21 (ii) during the period beginning July 1, 2001
3232 22 through June 30, 2011, 120 paid days or 600 paid hours
3333 23 in each school year;
3434
3535
3636
3737 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB4068 Introduced , by Rep. Kevin Schmidt SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
3838 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
3939 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
4040 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2026 (instead of June 30, 2023), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Deletes language concerning an additional 20 days or 100 paid hours that an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status for the period between July 1, 2021 and June 30, 2022. Effective immediately.
4141 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
4242 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
4343 A BILL FOR
4444
4545
4646
4747
4848
4949 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
5050
5151
5252
5353 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
5454
5555
5656
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 HB4068 LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
6464
6565
6666 HB4068- 2 -LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b HB4068 - 2 - LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
6767 HB4068 - 2 - LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b
6868 1 (iii) during the period beginning July 1, 2011
6969 2 through June 30, 2018, 100 paid days or 500 paid hours
7070 3 in each school year;
7171 4 (iv) beginning July 1, 2018 through June 30, 2026
7272 5 2023, 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school
7373 6 year, but not more than 100 paid days in the same
7474 7 classroom;
7575 8 (v) (blank); and during the period between July 1,
7676 9 2021 and June 30, 2022, an additional 20 paid days or
7777 10 100 paid hours shall be added to item (iv) of this
7878 11 paragraph (2) to assist with addressing the substitute
7979 12 teacher shortage that has been exacerbated by the
8080 13 ongoing global pandemic; and
8181 14 (vi) beginning July 1, 2026 2023, 100 paid days or
8282 15 500 paid hours in each school year.
8383 16 Where such permitted employment is partly on a daily and
8484 17 partly on an hourly basis, a day shall be considered as 5
8585 18 hours.
8686 19 (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to an annuitant who
8787 20 returns to teaching under the program established in Section
8888 21 16-150.1, for the duration of his or her participation in that
8989 22 program.
9090 23 (Source: P.A. 101-645, eff. 6-26-20; 102-537, eff. 8-20-21;
9191 24 102-709, eff. 4-22-22.)
9292 25 Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
9393 26 becoming law.
9494
9595
9696
9797
9898
9999 HB4068 - 2 - LRB103 31981 RPS 60774 b