House
|
10/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|