Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|