House | 02/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |