House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 08/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs | ||
House | 08/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 08/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Schmidt |