LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB4156
Action History
IL
Illinois House Bill HB4156
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois House Bill HB4156
Action History
House
06/29/2024
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
House
01/31/2024
Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
House
11/08/2023
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
House
10/18/2023
Referred to Rules Committee
House
10/18/2023
First Reading
House
10/04/2023
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke