House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Schmidt |