House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0806
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 051-008-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 010-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-026-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|