House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0808
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2026
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|