House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|