House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0810
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|