House
|
12/18/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 047-009-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-017-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|