House
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0597
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|