House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 11/29/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |