House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |