House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|