House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |