House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Ethics & Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|