House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 009-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|