House
|
12/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2024
|
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|