House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |