House | 06/29/2024 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |