Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|