House | 01/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |