House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0813
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
To Investigations and Reporting Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|