House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0815
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|