House
|
06/29/2024
|
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Postponed - Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|