House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |