House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jason Bunting |