House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0816
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|