Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-034-003
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|