House | 09/17/2024 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 09/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan | ||
House | 08/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 07/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 07/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 07/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |