House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0819
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 047-012-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-012-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 011-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|