House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |