Senate | 04/19/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-011-000 | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-004-000 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |