House | 05/31/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/26/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 | ||
House | 05/24/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |