House | 04/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |