House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |