House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|