House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0823
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|