House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|