House
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0603
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-011-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|