House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 014-005-000 | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health & Addiction Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |