House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |